Hodges v. Akeena Solar, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Hodges
Defendant: Akeena Solar, Inc., Barry Cinnamon and Gary Effren
Case Number: 5:2009cv02147
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 156 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds filed by David H. Gordon, Joel Gentleman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/15/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 12, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING REVISED PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting further revised proposed order. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 9, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requesting revised proposed order. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 8, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 140 Stipulation filed by David H. Gordon, Joel Gentleman. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 15, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH OR MODIFY SUBPOENAS TO NONPARTIES AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, re 65 MOTION to Quash filed by Barry Cinnamon, Gary Effren, Akeena Solar, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/14/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
May 6, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Deferring 65 MOTION to Quash. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 6, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 4, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: NOTICE TO CLASS. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 22, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Show Cause Why 65 Motion to Quash Should Not Be Denied As Moot. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 22, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
February 8, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff Sharon Hodges' Motion for a Protective Order re 92 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 8, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
January 11, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension re Briefing Schedule on Motion for Class Certification re 106 Stipulation. Reply due 1/19/2011. Motion hearing set for 2/7/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
December 13, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Expand Page Limits for Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Plaintiffs' Reply in Support re 98 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 17, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Briefing Schedule on Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re 91 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
October 14, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Briefing Schedule for Class Certification re 84 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 84 Stipulation: Motion due 10/22/2010. Responses due by 12/8/2010. Replies due by 1/14/2011. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 Denying in Part and Deferring in Part Defendants Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas, and for a Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 9/16/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
June 29, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Modify Scheduling Order re 57 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 3, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT re 45 Stipulation. Answer due 6/9/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
March 29, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Modification to Scheduling Order for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss re 35 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
December 14, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND STIPULATION RE SCHEDULING ORDER re 19 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2009. Deadline to File Motions to Dismiss due by 2/12/2010. Oppositions due 3/29/2010. Replies due 4/30/2009. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 8, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SCHEDULING ORDER re 15 Stipulation, 17 Case Management Statement. Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2009. Deadline to File Motions to Dismiss due by 2/12/2010. Oppositions due 3/29/2010. Replies due 4/30/2009. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2009 is VACATED. The Court will set a new date in its Order addressing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
June 16, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION RE:CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED CASES re 5 Stipulation. The Court declines to adopt the parties' Stipulation as premature. Once there are identifiable cases that the parties believe are related, they may file formal motions to relate and to consolidate when appropriate. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodges v. Akeena Solar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hodges
Represented By: Arthur L. Shingler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akeena Solar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Cinnamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Effren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?