ZL Technologies, Inc. v. Gartner Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: ZL Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Gartner Group, Inc. and Carol DiCenzo
Case Number: 5:2009cv02393
Filed: May 29, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 8, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 48 ). The Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2010 is CONTINUED to 5/21/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
March 5, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 45 . Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
December 16, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 35 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR: (1) RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY; AND (3) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/16/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 3, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 32 ). The Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2009 is CONTINUED to 1/22/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/3/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 4, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 13 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 19, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME re 22 . Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/13/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
September 1, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (approving 18 ). The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss set for 9/25/2009 is CONTINUED to 10/23/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/31/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
July 10, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CONSENT/DECLINATION DEADLINE. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZL Technologies, Inc. v. Gartner Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZL Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gartner Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol DiCenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?