Cardenas v. Irish Construction
Plaintiff: Luis Cardenas
Defendant: Irish Construction
Case Number: 5:2009cv02401
Filed: May 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(A)re 45 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING ALL PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT. In light of the settlement, the Court finds good cause to vacate all trial and pretrial dates. On or before 12/3/2010, the parties shall file a stipulated dismissa l pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by by 12/3/2010. Status Conference set for 12/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. If a voluntary dismissal is filed as ordered, the Status Conference will be automatically vacated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion from 6/14/2010 to 6/21/2010 re 39 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 22 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant Irish Construction's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER - (JURY TRIAL): Joint Pretrial Conference Statement, In Limine Motions, and Proposed Jury Instructions Due 9/27/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2010 11:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 11/9/2010 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 11/9/2009 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further trial specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DELAY OF RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL re 34 Stipulation, filed by Irish Construction. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on March 17, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING IN PART AS TO DEADLINES BEFORE JUDGE WARE re 26 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 14 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/5/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardenas v. Irish Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Cardenas
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irish Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?