The Mishewal Wappo Tribe of Alexander Valley v. Salazar
Plaintiff: The Mishewal Wappo Tribe of Alexander Valley
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Case Number: 5:2009cv02502
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting 185 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 186 Motion for Summary Judgment. Since this result represents a complete resolution of this case, judgment will be entered in favor of the Federal Defendants and the Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/23/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE; SETTING MOTION DEADLINES. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Status Conference Statement, the court finds that a conference is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Status Conferencescheduled for February 8, 2013, is VACATED. Based on Plaintiff's request, the court issues the following schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment: Deadline for serving and filing Motions for Summary Judgment due by 5/31/2013. Deadline for serving and filing Op positions to Motions for Summary Judgment due by 6/21/2013. Deadline for serving and filing Replies to Motions for Summary Judgment by 4/5/2013. Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment set for 7/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Please see Order for further specifics. ***2/8/2013 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. The parties shall conduct a conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(2) forthwith, and shall within 14 days of this order file a Joint Supplemental Case Management Statement which addresses the items listed in Rule 26(f)(3) to the extent those items apply. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Denying 153 Motion for Leave to Appeal. The hearing scheduled for 2/3/2012 as well as the Case Management Conference are VACATED. A separate order addressing scheduling will issue imminently. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/1/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012) Modified text on 2/1/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Deadlines for Briefing Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and Continuance of Case Management Conference re 154 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines 153 MOTION for Leave to Appeal From Order Denying Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1292(b). Plaintiff and Federal Defendants' Responses due by 1/13/2012. Counties' Replies due by 1/27/2012. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/28/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING 135 ; 145 Intervenors' Motion to Dismiss. The court schedules this action for a Case Management Conference on January 27, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement on or before January 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/24/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to Extend Time to File Reply ISO Motions for Intervention re 106 Stipulation. Reply due 1/18/2011. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by County of Lake. County of Lake terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 60 Stipulation. Mediation deadline set for 1/31/2011. Hearing on Intervenor-Defendants' Motions to Dismiss set for 2/14/2011 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time For Intervenor-Defendants Napa, Sonoma, and Lake Counties to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re 53 Stipulation. Response due 7/16/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/17/210. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint re 47 Stipulation. First Amended Complaint due by 5/11/2010 as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/6/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 15 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mishewal Wappo Tribe of Alexander Valley v. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mishewal Wappo Tribe of Alexander Valley
Represented By: Kelly F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?