Mabon v. Harvey
Petitioner: Troy Dominic Mabon, Jr.
Respondent: John W. Harvey
Case Number: 5:2009cv02817
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 32 Motion for Reconsideration. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 24 Motion Motion for Clarification, Denying Request for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Directing Respondent to Respond. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/28/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/25/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabon v. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Troy Dominic Mabon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John W. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?