Su v. National Aeronautics and Space Administration et al
Plaintiff: Haiping Su
Defendant: National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Christopher Scolese, Simon Peter Worden, Robert Dolci, Reginald Waddell, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Robert Swan Mueller, III, Sherman Kwok and Tom Ross
Case Number: 5:2009cv02838
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER RE: MOTIONS REGARDING FEES AND COSTS denying 277 Motion for Sanctions; denying 295 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 306 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/9/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 266 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/25/2014. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL ORDER. Due to a change in the court's availability, the Pretrial Order issued May 28, 2013 (re 220 , is modified such that the trial of this action shall now occur on the following dates and times: Bench Trial set for 12/5/2013, 12/6/2013, 12/9/2013, 12/10/2013, 12/11/2013 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to ADR Local Rule 7-2, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for a settlement conference to occur no later than 90 days from the date this order is filed. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/1/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PRETRIAL ORDER (BENCH TRIAL). On 5/24/2013, the parties appeared before Judge Edward J. Davila for a Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Based on the parties' Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement and the discussions held at the confer ence, the following schedule shall apply to this case: The parties shall meet and confer in order to reach an agreement on whether to engage court-sponsored or private mediation. On or before 6/7/2013, the parties shall file the form entitled "S tipulation and (Proposed) Order Selecting ADR Process" indicating their selection. Joint Final Pretrial Conference statement, Motions in Limine and Exchange of Exhibits due by 10/25/2013. Deadline to file Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due 11/1/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Bench Trial set for 12/3/2013, 12/4/2013, 12/5/2013, 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/28/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified text on 5/28/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 193 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/17/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 162 plaintiff's Motion to Compel.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 171 defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission. 6/28/2011 hearing is vacated.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/12/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATION AND ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 177 Continuing Hearing on 171 . Motion hearing continued to 6/28/2011, 10:00 AM in courtroom 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/4/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 146 defendants' Motion for Protective Order re the Deposition of Wende Hower. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Limited Extension of Discovery Deadlines Related to Defendants' Requests for Admission, Set One re 161 Stipulation. Accordingly, the parties hereby STIPULATE AND REQUEST that the March 28, 2011deadline for discov ery be extended for the limited purpose of the aforementioned productions, as follows: April 11, 2011 Production of any revised responses to Defendants RFAs to Plaintiff, Set One; April 18, 2011 Any motion to compel discovery for responses to Defendants' RFAs to Plaintiff, Set One. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LIMITED EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY DEADLINE RELATED TO DEPOSITION OF MR. PATRICK GRANT re 156 Stipulation. Accordingly, the parties hereby STIPULATE AND REQUEST that the March 28, 2011, deadline for discovery be extended for the limited purpose of the aforementioned deposition, as follows: April 11, 2011 Deposition of Mr. Patrick Grant. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Request to Continue Deadline for Hearing Dispositive Motion; Setting Briefing Schedule re 147 Stipulation. ***5/23/2011 Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 147 Stipulation: Motion due by 5/16/2011. Oppos ition due by 6/13/2011. Reply due by 6/27/2011. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 133 defendants' Motion to Compel. 3/15/2011 motion hearing is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/13/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 STIPULATION AND ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Enlargement of Time for Parties to Disclose Experts and Rebuttal Experts re 129 Letter. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/25/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES; SETTING SCHEDULING ORDER re 123 Joint Case Management Statement. The Court orders the cases consolidated as follows: (1) Since the 2009 case is the first filed case, it shall be the lead case. All future filings shall be filed in C 09-02838 only. In light of this consolidation, the Clerk of Court shall immediately close Su v. United States of America, Case No. C 10-0222 JW. (2) The Court also finds that a consolidated complaint is required. Accordingly, on or before 7/12/2010, Plaintiff shall filed a Consolidated Complaint. The Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2010 is VACATED. The parties are ordered to comply withe the following scheduling order: Close of All Discovery due by 3/28/2011. Last Date for He aring Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 2/18/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. None of the dates set in this Order may be changed w ithout an order of the Court made after a motion is filed pursuant to the Civil Local Rules of Court. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 75 defendants' Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 90 plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Motion hearing set for 4/13/2010 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting One-week Enlargement of Time for Defendants to File Reply re 79 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES 69 MOTION to Relate Case; (Correction of 76 Order on Motion to Relate Case ). Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified text on 3/4/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting 4-day Extension to Answer re 70 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 30-day extension to answer or otherwise respond re 64 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/23/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue ADR Telephone Conference re 41 Stipulation. The parties are to contact the ADR program after the Court's ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, no later than 11/30/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 30 Stipulation. Deadline for Robert Dolci, Robert Swan Mueller, III, Tom Ross, Sherman Kwok, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Christopher Scolese, Reginald Waddell, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Simon Peter Worden to respond due by 10/8/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Su v. National Aeronautics and Space Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haiping Su
Represented By: Michael Gannon Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Scolese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Peter Worden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dolci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Swan Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Kwok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?