Levin v. Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
Plaintiff: Roger M. Levin
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
Case Number: 5:2009cv02869
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/12/2010 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2010. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/29/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying without prejudice 30 Motion to Compel Mediation and cross-motion for summary judgment. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER 31 to Continue the 1/29/2010 Case Management Conference and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Contractual Mediation. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/26/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER 28 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2010 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/3/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 8 Motion to Remand (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Randomly Reassign This Action to the San Jose Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 6/30/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levin v. Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger M. Levin
Represented By: Joseph Hoffman, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?