Sierra Club et al v. California American Water Company et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Club and Carmel River Steelhead Association
Defendant: California American Water Company, Gary Locke, Jane Lubchenko and Rodney McInnis
Case Number: 5:2009cv02870
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/8/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMITTALS ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT re 42 . The initial case management conference set on 12/4/09 is vacated. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/18/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING 32 STIPULATION FOR STAY OF FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. California American Water Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Laurens H. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel River Steelhead Association
Represented By: Laurens H. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California American Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Lubchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?