RootZoo, Inc v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: RootZoo, Inc
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03043
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2012 Filing 288 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 204 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 2-46 to Declaration of Jonathan Shub In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Under Seal] by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 10, Part 1 of 2, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 10, Part 2 of 2, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 15, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 20, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 21, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 22, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 23, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 24, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 25, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 26, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 27, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 28, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 29, # 29 Exhibit Ex. 30, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 31, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 32, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 33, # 33 Exhibit Ex. 34, # 34 Exhibit Ex. 35, # 35 Exhibit Ex. 36, # 36 Exhibit Ex. 37, # 37 Exhibit Ex. 38, # 38 Exhibit Ex. 39, # 39 Exhibit Ex. 40, # 40 Exhibit Ex. 41, # 41 Exhibit Ex. 42, # 42 Exhibit Ex. 43, # 43 Exhibit Ex. 44, # 44 Exhibit Ex. 45, # 45 Exhibit Ex. 46)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 287 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 204 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Jonathan Shub In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Exhibit 1 by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1,Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Part 2 of 2)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 286 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 204 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points and Authorities [Under Seal] by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 285 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 254 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Class Certification [Under Seal] by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 284 RESPONSE to re 254 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Support of Motion for Class Certification [Redacted] by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 4, 2012 Filing 283 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosemary M. Rivas (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 20, 2012 Filing 282 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 7, 2012, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 9/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 281 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price for proceedings held on 03/07/2012 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton.. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/17/2012) Modified on 8/20/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2012 Filing 280 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING ON APPEAL PENDING IN THE NINTH CIRCUIT by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 278 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Filing 278 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING ON APPEAL IN NINTH CIRCUIT filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 23, 2012 Filing 277 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' RULE 23(f) PETITION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/23/2012)
July 19, 2012 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 44611009131 (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 276 USCA Case Number 12-16601 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 Filing 275 DISREGARD - WRONG ATTACHMENT USCA Case Number 12-16601 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012) Modified on 7/19/2012 (kk, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER of USCA granting permission to appeal (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 262 Motion for Leave to Appear on behalf of class action plaintiffs (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 2, 2012 Filing 272 CLERKS NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the May 17, 2012 case management conference is VACATED. The parties shall notify the court of Court of Appeals decision on plaintiffs petition.(THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER re 262 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Attorney for Class Action Plaintiffs filed by Eric D. Freed. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/2/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 269 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RULE 23(f) PETITION (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 27, 2012 Filing 270 USCA Case Number 12-80104 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals re: petition for permission to appeal (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 268 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Facebooks Notice Of Withdrawal Of Facebooks Motion To Stay Discovery Pending Ruling On Class Certification, Or In The Alternative, For A Protective Order Precluding Apex Depositions (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 205 Motion to Certify Class; granting 265 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 265 MOTION for Leave to File STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Fox Test Prep. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 12, 2012 Filing 264 CLERKS NOTICE re Deficiency of docket entry 263 . (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 11, 2012 Filing 263 See document 265 For Corrected Entry.STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byFox Test Prep. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/13/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2012 Filing 262 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Attorney for Class Action Plaintiffs filed by Eric D. Freed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit A4, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(Freed, Eric) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Matthew M. Brown filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew M. Brown ISO Facebook's Admin Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Facebook's Admin Motion to File Under Seal)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 4, 2012 Filing 260 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Class Certification, or in the alternative, for a Protective Order Precluding Apex Depositions filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/18/2012. Replies due by 4/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian ISO Facebook's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Class Cert, # 2 Exhibit A to Somvichian Decl, # 3 Exhibit B to Somvichian Decl, # 4 Exhibit C to Somvichian Decl, # 5 Exhibit D to Somvichian Decl, # 6 Declaration of Matthew M. Brown ISO Facebook's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Class Cert, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Facebook's Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Class Cert)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 259 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byFox Test Prep. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 258 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 253 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Matthew M. Brown ISO Facebook's Opp to Mot for Class Cert by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Brown Decl - under seal, # 2 Exhibit B to Brown Decl - under seal, # 3 Exhibit C to Brown Decl - under seal, # 4 Exhibit H to Brown Decl - under seal, # 5 Exhibit I to Brown Decl - under seal, # 6 Exhibit K to Brown Decl - under seal, # 7 Exhibit L to Brown Decl - under seal)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 257 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 253 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Peter M. Colosi ISO Facebook 's Opp To Mot For Class Cert by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E to Colosi Declaration - under seal, # 2 Exhibit F to Colosi Declaration - under seal)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 256 RESPONSE (re 205 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED] ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Colosi ISO Facebook's Opp to Plt Mot for Class Cert - Redacted, # 2 Exhibit A to Colosi Decl - Redacted, # 3 Exhibit B to Colosi Decl - Redacted, # 4 Exhibit C to Colosi Decl, # 5 Exhibit D to Colosi Decl, # 6 Exhibit G to Colosi Decl, # 7 Exhibit H to Colosi Decl, # 8 Exhibit I to Colosi Decl - Redacted, # 9 Exhibit J to Colosi Decl - Redacted, # 10 Declaration of Matthew M. Brown ISO Facebook's Opp to Plt Mot for Class Cert, # 11 Exhibit D to Brown Decl, # 12 Exhibit E to Brown Decl, # 13 Exhibit F to Brown Decl, # 14 Exhibit G to Brown Decl, # 15 Exhibit J to Brown Decl)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 255 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 253 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Errata re Order Granting Facebooks Admin Mot to File Under Seal Facebooks Opposition to Mot for Class Cert and Declarations in Support (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 254 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 229 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 253 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 252 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton finding as moot 249 Motion.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 7, 2012 Filing 251 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2012 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 3/7/2012) re 205 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED] filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 250 RESPONSE (re 249 Unopposed Administrative Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom During Portions of the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/6/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 Filing 249 Unopposed Administrative Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom During Portions of the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Fox Test Prep. Responses due by 3/19/2012. Replies due by 3/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/5/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Statement of Recent Decision Re Def. Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 205 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 247 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY RE DOCUMENT # 246 (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 2, 2012 Filing 246 ***INCORRECT EVENT USED, SEE DOCUMENT # 249 *** NOTICE by Fox Test Prep Plaintiffs' Unopposed Administrative Motion for an Order Closing the Courtroom During Portions of the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 3/2/2012) Modified on 3/5/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byFox Test Prep. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 206 , 205 ) (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER TO PERMIT EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM re 243 Proposed Order filed by Unified ECM, Inc., Matthew Smith, Fox Test Prep, RootZoo, Inc, Steven Price, Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/13/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 9, 2012 Filing 243 JOINT REQUEST AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO PERMIT EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc., Unified ECM Inc, Matthew Smith, Facebook Inc (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 2/9/2012) Modified on 2/10/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 205 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED]. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 239 Stipulation filed by Fox Test Prep. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/18/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Statement of Recent Decisions Re Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Oppostion to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 205 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byFox Test Prep. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 206 , 205 ) (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 239 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Rescheduling Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Fox Test Prep. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 1/6/2012) Modified on 1/9/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2012 Filing 238 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Richard Joseph Burke (Burke, Richard) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 237 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Burke, Richard) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 4, 2012 Filing 236 CLERKS NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on February 22, 2012 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 3 on the 3rd floor of the Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California, the HONORABLE PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON will conduct the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, in this matter., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 205 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED]. Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 28, 2011 Filing 235 Plaintiffs' Response to 233 Facebook's Objection to Plaintiffs' Reply Evidence by Fox Test Prep. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 12/28/2011) Modified on 12/29/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 231 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Richard J. Burke. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 233 OBJECTIONS to Reply Evidence as Found in Portions of Expert Rebuttal Report of Markus Jakobsson by Facebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 232 Declaration of Robert Kang-Xing Jin in Support of 229 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) RE: PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) RE: PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION and [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Brief filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 229 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 14, 2011 Filing 231 MOTION of Richard J. Burke for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611008129.) Filling fee previously paid on 12/14/2011 filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 8, 2011 Filing 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price RE: PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 8, 2011 Filing 229 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d) RE: PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Rosemary Rivas, # 2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
November 21, 2011 Filing 228 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price re 223 Statement NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE JOINT REPORT # 1 (DOCKET NO. 223) SUBMITTED TO HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOWARD R. LLOYD (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 227 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 11/17/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/17/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 226 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Facebook, Inc.. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 11/10/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2011 Filing 225 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents (James Hung) served on Sheila Green on 10/26/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 224 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents (James M. Aquilina) served on Sheila Green on 10/26/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 223 Statement re Discovery Matter (Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1) by Facebook, Inc.. (Colosi, Peter) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 26, 2011 Filing 222 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO JAMES M. AQUILINA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 26, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO JAMES HUNG (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FACEBOOK, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CERTAIN DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 Filing 218 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FACEBOOK, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND CERTAIN DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kang-Xing Jin, # 2 Declaration of Matthew M. Brown, # 3 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 24, 2011 Filing 217 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents of Microsoft Corporation served on Melynda L. Warner on 10/11/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 17, 2011 Filing 216 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents for Yahoo! Inc. served on Maria Sanchez on 10/12/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 215 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena for Production of Documents to Google, Inc. served on Registered Agent for Service - CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service on 10/11/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO MICROSOFT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 213 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO GOOGLE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 212 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO YAHOO! INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Guido Saveri (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 210 ASSOCIATION of Counsel of Saveri & Saveri, Inc. by Fox Test Prep. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 208 Stipulation filed by Steven Price, Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 208 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Deadlines for Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification and Proposed Order, filed by Facebook, Inc., Steven Price. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/29/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/27/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 206 Declaration of JONATHAN SHUB in Support of 205 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED]First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED] DECLARATION OF JONATHAN SHUB IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION [REDACTED] filed byFox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Related document(s) 205 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 205 First MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF [REDACTED] filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. Responses due by 10/14/2011. Replies due by 11/11/2011. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 203 Declaration of Robert Kang-Xing Jin in Support of 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal for Order Sealing Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Administrative Motion to File Under Seal for Order Sealing Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plts Admin Mot To File Under Seal)(Related document(s) 197 ) (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo! Inc. re 201 Declaration in Support,, (Caplan, David) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 201 Declaration of David K. Caplan in Support of 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal for Order Sealing Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Administrative Motion to File Under Seal for Order Sealing Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byYahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS PRODUCED BY NON-PARTY YAHOO! INC. BEARING PRODUCTION NUMBERS YAHOO-1 THROUGH YAHOO-30 PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d))(Related document(s) 197 ) (Caplan, David) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 199 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 198 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed byFox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal for Order Sealing Documents Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER TO INCREASE THE PAGE LIMIT OF ALL BRIEFING RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (granting 193 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/1/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Steven N. Berk (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 194 STIPULATION re 193 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Increase the Page Limit of all Briefing Related to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Increase the Page Limit of all Briefing Related to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification] by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 193 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Increase the Page Limit of all Briefing Related to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification] filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 191 NOTICE of Change of Address by David R. Buchanan (Buchanan, David) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 192 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Steven N. Berk ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 3411063114.) filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 189 ). The Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/13/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 189 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Case Management Conference by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME ON MOTIONS RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 185 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/20/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 178 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/28/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 183 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin G. Edelman (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 185 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time On Motions Related to Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification by Facebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 184 Proposed Order re 183 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611003800.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611003800.) by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 183 MOTION for Attorney Benjamin G. Edelman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 54611003800.) filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF DEPOSITION DIRECTED TO ERNST & YOUNG, INC. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 9, 2011 Filing 181 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents OF MEDALLIA, INC. served on Judy Chan on 04/22/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 180 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents OF ADPARLOR, INC. served on Gareth Smith on 04/26/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 179 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena for Production of Documents OF EFFICIENT FRONTIER, INC. served on Becky DeGeorge on 04/21/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 178 STIPULATION re 95 Stipulation and Order AMENDED by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 177 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents OF DIGITAL ENVOY, INC. served on Linda Banks on 04/22/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 176 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena for Production of Documents OF BUDDY MEDIA, INC. served on Tracy Petrillo on 04/25/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 175 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents OF MARIN SOFTWARE served on Melissa Albers on 04/20/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 174 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF MEDALLIA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF BUDDY MEDIA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 172 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF EFFICIENT FRONTIER, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 171 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF MARIN SOFTWARE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 170 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF ADPARLOR, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc re 168 Notice (Other) (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 11, 2011 Filing 167 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Paul Gignac (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER GRANTING 150 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents served on Michael Gubbels on 03/25/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 164 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify served on Michael Gubbels on 03/25/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 163 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 162 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 161 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/22/2011 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 3/22/2011) re 150 MOTION to Compel filed by Steven Price. (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 159 REPLY (re 150 MOTION to Compel ) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed byFox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 3 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 160 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/4/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 3/4/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 158 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 154 Opposition/Response to Motion (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 156 Declaration of THOMAS CARRIERO in Support of 154 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Thomas Carriero In Support Of Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 154 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 155 Declaration of PETER M. COLOSI in Support of 154 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Peter M. Colosi In Support Of Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 154 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 154 RESPONSE (re 150 MOTION to Compel ) Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 146 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Harvey Kesner (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 152 EXHIBITS re 150 MOTION to Compel Declaration of Jonathan Shub in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Production of Documents filed bySteven Price. (Related document(s) 150 ) (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 151 Request for Judicial Notice re 150 MOTION to Compel filed bySteven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 150 ) (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 150 MOTION to Compel filed by Steven Price. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 3 Proposed Order)(Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 148 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint byFacebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 149 Proposed Order re 146 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611055707.) by RootZoo, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 147 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 146 ***Proposed Order re 146 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611055707.) by RootZoo, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/10/2011 (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2011 Filing 146 MOTION for Attorney Harvey Kesner for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611055707.) filed by RootZoo, Inc. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 145 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Microsoft, Corp. served on Melyuda Warner on 1/13/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Google, Inc. served on Becky Degeorge on 1/13/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Yahoo!, Inc. served on Maria Sanchez on 1/13/2011, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 142 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc [Notice of Subpoena to Microsoft Corp.] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 141 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc [Notice of Subpoena to Google Inc.] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 12, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc [Notice of Subpoena to Yahoo! Inc.] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 10, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 3, 2011 Filing 137 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 21, 2010 Filing 136 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING 109 MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/15/2010. (jflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 134 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 12/3/2010) re 109 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is taken under submission. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/3/2010) Modified on 2/2/2011 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2010 Filing 133 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Joint Case Management Conference Statement] filed by Facebook, Inc., Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Anchor Intelligence served on Marc Brown on 11/23/2010, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 131 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Ad Testificandum served on John Cathey on 11/24/2010, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Click Forensics served on John Cathey on 11/24/2010, filed by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 128 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 127 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 126 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE by Fox Test Prep, Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 123 Reply to Opposition re Facebook Inc's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 123 Reply to Opposition re 109 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 122 ERRATA re 121 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Complaint by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Fox Test Prep. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 121 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's 109 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySteven Price. (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 11/12/2010) Modified on 11/15/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 111 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stan M. Doerrer (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 119 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Ad Testificandum of George W. Ivie served on Albana Gashi on 11/02/2010, filed by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Media Rating Council, Inc. served on Albana Gash on 11/02/2010, filed by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 117 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Ad Testificandum of Randall Rothenberg served on Molly Flynn on 11/01/2010, filed by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 116 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena Duces Tecum of Interactive Advertising Bureau served on Molly Flynn on 11/01/2010, filed by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 115 NOTICE by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc. OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 114 NOTICE by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc. OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc. OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 112 NOTICE by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc. OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 111 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Stan M. Doerrer ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008368.). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(srmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 109 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint re [Proposed] Order (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER APPROVING 106 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME ON ALL MOTIONS RELATED TO PLAINTFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/8/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified on 11/30/2010 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 106 Stipulation (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 106 STIPULATION re 101 Amended Complaint Stipulation Extending Time On All Motions Related to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 102 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David R. Buchanan (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 104 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/17/2010, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2010. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 103 Proposed Order re 102 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611008205.) by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 102 MOTION for Attorney David R. Buchanan for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611008205.) filed by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010) .
September 24, 2010 Filing 101 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc.. Filed bySteven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 100 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/17/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 9/17/2010). (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 98 Joint Case Management Statement (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 98 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS 79 FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT in case 5:09-cv-03043-JF by Judge Jeremy Fogel. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 96 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/06/2010, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2010. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS AMENDED BY THE COURT re 89 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/16/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 94 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 8/6/2010) re 79 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is taken under submission. Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc., Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith re 92 Joint Case Management Statement (Joint Case Management Conference Statement) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 92 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Case Management Conference Statement) filed by Facebook, Inc., Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 90 Reply to Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 90 Reply to Opposition re 79 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss The First Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 89 STIPULATION by Steven Price. (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 88 Opposition to Defendants 79 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySteven Price. (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 7/16/2010) Modified on 7/19/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/19/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: AMENDED BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT (granting 85 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/30/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 30, 2010 Filing 86 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by J. Paul Gignac (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 Filing 85 STIPULATION to Amend Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Steven Price. (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 Filing 84 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** STIPULATION to Amend Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss by Steven Price. (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/29/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2010 Filing 83 CLERKS NOTICE The Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2010 is RESET for 8/6/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 79 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss The First Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 81 Declaration of PETER M. COLOSI in Support of 79 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss The First Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 79 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 80 Declaration of CRAIG W. CLARK in Support of 79 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss The First Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 79 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss The First Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 77 Stipulation Extending Time On All Motions Related to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 25, 2010 Filing 77 STIPULATION re 76 Amended Complaint Extending Time On All Motions Related to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and [Proposed] Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc.. Filed bySteven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 13, 2010 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 6/3/10 is set for 9:30 a.m. Pacific time and not 10:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 6/2/10 has been rescheduled to 6/3/10 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 10, 2010 Filing 74 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/07/2010, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2010. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/7/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 5/7/2010). Further Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/7/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING 70 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CIVIL LOCAL RULE 16-10(a). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/3/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 Filing 72 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - updated filed by Facebook, Inc., Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 70 MOTION from Civil Local Rule 16-10(a) Administrative Motion For Relief from Civil Local Rule 16-10(a) MOTION from Civil Local Rule 16-10(a) Administrative Motion For Relief from Civil Local Rule 16-10(a) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 70 MOTION from Civil Local Rule 16-10(a) Administrative Motion For Relief from Civil Local Rule 16-10(a) filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 46 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Address by J. Paul Gignac (Gignac, J. Paul) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 67 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 68 . *** NOTICE of Change of Address by J. Paul Gignac (Gignac, J.) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/14/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2010 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon M. Fauth, Jr (Fauth, Gordon) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re 63 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Whitty Somvichian (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 65 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2010 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 3/5/2010) re 46 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion is taken under submission. Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 62 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/05/2010, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Clanton, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2010. (Clanton, Summer) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 2, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by DB on 3/2/10. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 6/2/10 at 11:00 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 19, 2010 Filing 61 Reply Memorandum re 46 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Gray, Thomas) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Mickel Montalban Arias (Arias, Mickel) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 11, 2010 Filing 59 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 3/2/10 at 11:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 8, 2010 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Meeker Harnett (Harnett, Melissa) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 8, 2010 Filing 57 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CO-LEAD, LIAISON AND CLASS COUNSEL re 22 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/3/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 55 Request for Judicial Notice re 54 Memorandum in Opposition (Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas) filed bySteven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 54 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 54 Memorandum in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySteven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: (1) CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AND (2) AMENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR THE MOTION TO DISMISS (approving 51 ). The Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2010 are CONTINUED to 3/5/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010) Modified on 1/21/2010 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2010 Filing 51 STIPULATION Continuing the Case Management Conference and Amending the Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Kiley L. Grombacher In Support of Joint Stipulation)(Gignac, J.) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 49 ). The Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2010 is CONTINUED to 2/26/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 49 STIPULATION Regarding Continuance of Case Management Conference by Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gignac, J.) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for TerriAnne Benedetto (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 47 Declaration of Mark Howitson in Support of 46 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 46 ) (Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss The Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 45 Proposed Order re 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006492.) by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION for Attorney TerriAnne Benedetto for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 54611006492.) filed by Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith, Unified ECM, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 22 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD, LIAISON AND CLASS COUNSEL. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 14, 2009 Filing 42 CLERKS NOTICE The hearing on the motion to appoint counsel is VACATED. The Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2009 is CONTINUED to 2/19/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 33 , Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/10/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 40 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc., Steven Price, RootZoo, Inc, Matthew Smith. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 7, 2009 Filing 39 Reply to Opposition re 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memo of Law ISO Motion filed byRootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 3, 2009 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 1, 2009 Filing 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gignac, J.) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 30, 2009 Filing 36 Memorandum in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memo of Law ISO Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 30, 2009 Filing 35 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/19/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 33 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by RootZoo, Inc , JOINT (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of RootZoo Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 20, 2009 Filing 31 EXHIBITS re 30 Complaint filed byRootZoo, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 30 ) (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 20, 2009 Filing 30 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.). Filed byRootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (gm, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 27 . Initial Case Management Conference continued to 12/18/2009 09:00 AM, to be heard with the motion. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/5/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiley Lynn Grombacher (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 27 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] Order to Continue Case Management Conference, Joint by RootZoo, Inc. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 26 Proposed Order re 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memo of Law ISO Motion by Steven Price. (Gignac, J.) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 25 Declaration of J. Paul Gignac in Support of 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memo of Law ISO Motion filed bySteven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Gignac, J.) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 24 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas in Support of 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memo of Law ISO Motion filed bySteven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Gignac, J.) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 23 Declaration of Jonathan Shub in Support of 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memo of Law ISO Motion filed bySteven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Gignac, J.) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Memo of Law ISO Motion filed by Steven Price. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Gignac, J.) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RELATION AND CONSOLIDATION OF CASES re (19 in 5:09-cv-03043-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 21, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 13 Notice (Other), 11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-7(e) (Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 20, 2009 Filing 19 STIPULATION re Relation and Consolidation of Cases; Filing of Amended Complaint and Response by Unified ECM, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Relation and Consolidation of Cases)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfredo Torrijos (Torrijos, Alfredo) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vincent Storti (Storti, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2009 is continued to 11/13/2009 09:00 AM, to be heard with the motion, in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 15 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
September 23, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Kellner (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 21, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 13 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of New Hearing Date (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 12 Declaration of Mark Howitson in Support of 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Padilla, Angela) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 21, 2009 Filing 10 WAIVER OF the SERVICE of Summons Returned Executed filed by RootZoo, Inc. Service waived by Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 7/9/2009, answer due 9/8/2009. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified on 8/21/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2009 Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 08/04/09. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/4/2009) Modified on 8/5/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2009 Filing 5 Administrative MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related re (09-3430PVT) filed by Unified ECM, Inc. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/3/2009) Modified on 8/4/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2009 Filing 4 Amended Notice of Appearance by Eric David Freed (Freed, Eric) (Filed on 7/15/2009) Text modified on 7/16/2009 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 7, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2009. Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2009 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes Judge Lloyd, # 2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases - San Jose Division, # 3 Standing Order for all Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 7, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 7, 2009 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611005526). Filed by RootZoo, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RootZoo, Inc v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RootZoo, Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?