Chinivasagam v. Equilon Enterprises, LLC
Plaintiff: Marilyn Jo Chinivasagam
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv03136
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2801 Petroleum Marketing Practices Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting 110 MOTION to Amend/Correct; AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING Request for Court Order to Preserve Rights to Complete Discovery After Current Discovery Cut-off Date re 71 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for Defendant to Lodge and Serve its Initial Expert Designation re 47 Stipulation. All other deadlines shall remain unchanged. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; REFERRING CASE TO JUDGE TRUMBULL FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties are referred to Magistrate Judge Trumbull for the purpose of settlement. On or before 5/24/2010, the parties shall contact Judge Trumb ull to schedule a settlement conference. Preliminary Pretrial conference due by 7/2/2010. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing re Preliminary Injunction; 37 MOTION for Summar y Judgment set for 7/12/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Court orders that Thomas Paul Bleau, Lead Counsel for Plaintiff appear at the 7/12/2010 hearing and Preliminary Pretrial Conference and any settlement conference ordered by Judge Trumbull. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 35 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INTERIM ORDER re 19 Parties Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/27/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER DENIED AS PREMATURE for Magistrate Judge Settlement Conference re 21 Stipulation. The Stipulation is denied as premature and without prejudice to being renewed once the partieshave taken some initial discovery and find that a Settlement Conference with a Magistrate would be fruitful. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIM TO NAME ADDITIONAL COUNTER DEFENDANT AND TO AMEND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT re 20 Stipulation. The Defendant Shall file the First Amended Complaint Counterclaim and Amended Answer to the Complaint as separte docket entry by 1/15/10. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/12/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING STAY; EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER re 11 Stipulation. The Court DENIES the parties' Stipulation to Stay since thiscase is not scheduled for an Initial Case Management until 1/11/2010. On or before 12/10/2009, Defendants shall file and serve its Answer. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Compliant re 8 Stipulation. Deadline for Equilon Enterprises, LLC to respond by 9/10/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chinivasagam v. Equilon Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Jo Chinivasagam
Represented By: Thomas P. Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?