Cellectricon AB et al v. Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cellectricon AB and Gyros AB
Defendant: Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03150
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ronald M Whyte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 STIPULATION AND ORDER #160 of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/3/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013) Modified on 1/3/2013 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 Filing 160 Stipulation of Dismissal and (Proposed) Order filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/17/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2011 Filing 159 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE 12/9/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 158 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/8/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 Filing 157 NOTICE of Change in Attorney Contact Information by Brian M. Gaff (Gaff, Brian) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). Clerk made changes to address as indicated
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER RELATING CASE to C-11-03009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/2/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 156 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 7/29/2011 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 7/29/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/29/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 154 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Cellectricon AB, Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Loesch, Salumeh) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER #152 Regarding Severance of Case. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 152 Joint Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Regarding Severance of Case by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Gaff, Brian) (Filed on 6/17/2011) Modified on 6/17/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part #120 Motion to Lift Stay; granting #139 Motion to Sever. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 150 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03-25-2011, before Judge Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/9/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2011. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting #141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 148 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2011 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 3/25/2011) re #120 MOTION to Stay Motion to Lift Stay and Reopen Litigation filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB, #139 MOTION to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 STIPULATION AND ORDER #136 Shortening Time for Defendant's Motion to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate. Motion Hearing is set for 3/25/2011 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/22/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #139 MOTION to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 146 Reply in Support of Motion to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate (re #139 filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/21/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 16, 2011 Filing 145 Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate (re #139 filed by Cellectricon AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 3/16/2011) Modified on 3/17/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2011 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of its Motion to Lift Stay and Reopen Litigation and supporting Declarations and Exhibits Cellectricon AB (Andara, Lael) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2011 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #142 by Cellectricon AB (Andara, Lael) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/15/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 142 Reply in Support of its Motion to Lift Stay and Reopen Litigation (re #141 filed by Cellectricon AB. (Attachments: #1 Broms Declaration Redacted, #2 Weber Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex A, #4 Exhibit Ex B Redacted, #5 Exhibit Ex B-1, #6 Errata Ex B-2, #7 Exhibit Ex B-3, #8 Exhibit Ex B-4 Redacted, #9 Exhibit Ex B-5, #10 Exhibit Ex B-6, #11 Exhibit Ex B-7, #12 Exhibit Ex C Redacted)(Smith, Neil) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 141 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Cellectricon AB. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 (Proposed) Order )(Smith, Neil) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 140 Declaration of Service Via Electronic Mail and U.S. Mail re #139 MOTION to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 139 Notice of Motion and Motion to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/23/2011 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 138 Declaration of Service Via Electronic Mail and U.S. Mail re #136 Stipulation, #137 Declaration in Support, by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 137 Declaration of Kaycie L. Wall in Support of Local Rule 6-2 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time on Defendant's Motion to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate re ( #136 ) filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2011 Filing 136 Local Rule 6-2 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Shortening Time for Defendant's Motion to Sever or, in the Alternative, to Bifurcate by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 3/11/2011) Modified on 3/14/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2011 Filing 135 Objection to Fluxion's Motion to File Declaration of Jensen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay, Under Seal re ( #127 ) filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 3/10/2011) Modified on 3/11/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 134 Proof of Service re re #130 Opposition/Response to Motion, #131 Declaration in Support, #129 Notice of Appearance, #132 Declaration in Support by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc (Loesch, Salumeh) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 133 Proof of Service re of SEALED Declaration of Jeff Jensen in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Loesch, Salumeh) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 Filing 132 Declaration of Cristian Ionescu-Zanetti in Support of in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' MOTION to Life Stay and Reopen Litigation re #130 filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H) (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/4/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 Filing 131 Declaration of Deakin T. Lauer in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' MOTION to Life Stay and Reopen Litigation re #130 filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/4/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 Filing 130 Opposition to Plaintiff's MOTION to Life Stay and Reopen Litigation (re #120 filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/4/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Fluxion Bioscienes, Inc. (Halpern, Kenneth) (Filed on 3/4/2011) Modified on 3/7/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2011 Filing 128 Declaration of Salumeh R. Loesch in Support of #127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #127 ) (Loesch, Salumeh) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 4, 2011 Filing 127 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loesch, Salumeh) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance of Kaycie Lynn Wall filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying #121 Motion to Shorten Time (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #123 Declaration in Support, (Love, Jeffrey) by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.(Filed on 2/23/2011) Modified on 2/24/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2011 Filing 123 Declaration of Jeff Love in Support of Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion for Lifting Stay re #122 filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2011) Modified on 2/24/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2011 Filing 122 Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion for Lifting Stay re #121 filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Love In Support, #2 Exhibit A) (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2011) Modified on 2/24/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2011 Filing 121 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing Plainitff's Motion for Lifting Stay (Decl. Andara and Exhibits) filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Andara, Lael) (Filed on 2/18/2011) Modified on 2/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2011 Filing 120 Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for Lifting the Stay filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay and Reopen Litigation, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Brian M. Gaff ISO Motion to Lift Stay, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gaff, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Gaff, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Gaff, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Gaff, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Gaff, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Gaff, #9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Gaff, #10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Gaff, #11 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Lifting The Stay)(Smith, Neil) (Filed on 2/18/2011) Modified on 2/22/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 Filing 119 STIPULATION Regarding Private Mediation by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Salumeh R. Loesch. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #112 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Deakin T. Lauer. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER #110 Regarding Court ADR, Case is removed from Court Mediation and Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/6/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 5, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #102 Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Hearings,. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 16, 2010 Filing 115 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Salumeh R. Loesch to appear in Pro Hac Vice re #114 by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 16, 2010 Filing 114 Application for Admission of Attorney Salumeh R. Loesch to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008728) filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 16, 2010 Filing 113 (Proposed) Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Deakin T. Lauer to appear in Pro Hac Vice re #112 by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 16, 2010 Filing 112 Application for Admission of Attorney Deakin T. Lauer to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611008727) filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 Filing 111 Proof of Service re #110 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation, #108 Notice of Appearance, #109 Notice (re Defendant's Mediation Report by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/15/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2010 Filing 110 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order selecting Mediation by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/15/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2010 Filing 109 Mediation Report by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2010) Modified on 12/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeffrey S. Love on behalf of Defendant Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Love, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2010) Modified on 12/14/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2010 Filing 107 NOTICE of firm Affillation and change of Address by Eric Lance Wesenberg (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 12/8/2010) Modified on 12/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 12/6/2010 with Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 106 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 12/6/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Please use call-in #: 661-673-8600; access code 956682. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #104 Notice of Plaintiff's Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB (Gaff, Brian) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2010 Filing 104 Notice of Plaintiff's Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Gaff, Brian) (Filed on 11/24/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 Filing 103 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND TO RESET CERTAIN BRIEFING DEADLINES by Cellectricon AB, Fluxion Biosciences, Inc., Gyros AB. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 102 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/12/2010 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 11/12/2010). Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting #97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER #99 Continuing Further Case Management on Stay of Litigation. Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/28/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 99 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Further Case Management Conference on Stay of Litigation by Cellectricon AB, Fluxion Biosciences, Inc., Gyros AB. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 Filing 98 EXHIBITs C-F to the Joint Status Conference Statement re #97 filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F) (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Text modified on 10/25/2010 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 Filing 97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to civil L.R. 97-5(B) and (c) filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 (Proposed) Order (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #92 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order , Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support, Declaration of Brian M. Gaff, Esq., in Support, Declaration of Stephen G. Weber, Ph.D., in Support, and (Proposed) Order by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 10/20/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 95 Declaration of Stephen G. Weber, Ph.D. in Support of Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order re #92 filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 10/20/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 94 Declaration of Brian M. Gaff, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order re #92 filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 10/20/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 93 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order re #92 filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Text modified on 10/20/2010 conforming to posted document caption; incorrect event type used when posting document (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Filing 92 Notice of Motion and Motion by Plainitffs' to Compel Compliance with Court Order re ( #84 ) filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with Court Order) (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Linkage added on 10/20/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER #90 Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/13/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 90 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 10/8/2010) Modified on 10/12/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 Filing 89 CLERKS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #85 withdrawal of counsel. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/17/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #85 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/5/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel and (Proposed) Order Thereon by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB (Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 8/4/2010) Modified on 8/5/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/17/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part #63 Motion to Stay, and setting status conference for October 8, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 87 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2010 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 7/23/2010) re #63 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Request for Reexamination filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 83 Declaration of Jeff Jensen in Support of #82 Reply Memorandum, [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] filed byFluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #82 ) (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 82 Reply Memorandum re #63 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Request for Reexamination [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] FLUXION BIOSCIENCES, INC.S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING DECISION ON REQUEST FOR REEXAMINATION filed byFluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 81 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #79 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [CONFIDENTIAL] DECLARATION OF JEFF JENSEN IN SUPPORT OF FLUXION BIOSCIENCES, INC.S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING DECISION ON REQUEST FOR REEXAMINATION by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Angell, Jason) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 80 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #79 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [CONFIDENTIAL] FLUXION BIOSCIENCES, INC.S REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION PENDING DECISION ON REQUEST FOR REEXAMINATION by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part #75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER #73 : Tutorial Hearing set for 2/8/2011 9:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/9/2011 09:00 AM. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/12/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Tutorial Hearing set for 2/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. re #75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Fishman, Deborah) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 76 Declaration of Jason S. Angell In Support Of Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.'s Reply Memo In Support Of Its Motion To Stay Litigation Pending Decision On Request For Reexamination (Filed Under Seal) filed byFluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 part 1, #6 Exhibit 5 part 2, #7 Exhibit 5 part 3, #8 Exhibit 5 part 4, #9 Exhibit 5 part 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8 part 1, #13 Exhibit 8 part 2, #14 Exhibit 9)(Angell, Jason) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 75 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Fishman, Deborah) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 74 Declaration of Neil A. Smith in Support of #73 Letter, DECLARATION OF NEIL A. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF LETTER SUBMITTING PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed byCellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #73 ) (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 73 Letter from Neil A. Smith Plaintiffs' Letter and Proposed Case Management Order in Response to Defendant's Letter and Proposed Case Management Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Plaintiffs' Version of Proposed Case Management Order))(Smith, Neil) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Sheffield Angell (Angell, Jason) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 71 Letter from Eric L. Wesenberg [Refiled with Correct Date of July 6, 2010]. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 70 Letter from Eric L. Wesenberg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 69 Declaration of Brian M. Gaff in Support of #68 Memorandum in Opposition DECLARATION OF BRIAN M. GAFF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY filed byCellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #68 ) (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 68 Memorandum in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Request for Reexamination filed byCellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER #60 Selecting ADR Process, Case referred to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/23/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 66 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/11/2010 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 6/11/2010). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. re #63 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Request for Reexamination, #64 Declaration in Support,, (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 64 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Howard in Support of #63 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Request for Reexamination filed byFluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1 (Cont.), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2 (Cont.), #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 3 (Cont.), #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 4 (Cont.), #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #63 ) (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Decision on Request for Reexamination filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah E. Fishman on Behalf of Fluxion Biosciences (Fishman, Deborah) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 61 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement of All Parties, Filed in Advance of June 11, 2010 Case Management Conference filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 60 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB , and Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 59 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. re #57 Certificate of Interested Entities (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER #51 Continuing Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/20/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 19, 2010 Filing 55 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Fluxion Biosciences (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Gyros AB (Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 53 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Cellectricon AB (Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 52 Declaration of Neil A. Smith in Support of #51 Stipulation filed byCellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 51 STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Smith, Neil) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 50 CLERKS NOTICE OF SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2010. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 49 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #47 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CELLECTRICON AB'S AND GYROS AB'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL byCellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 8, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Siddhartha M. Venkatesan (Venkatesan, Siddhartha) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 47 Fluxion Biosciences, Inc's ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended), First COUNTERCLAIM Seeking Declaratory Relief against Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB byFluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER #43 Granting Re-Substitution of Plaintiffs' Counsel, Attorney David G. Conlin, Nell A. Smith, Nathaniel Bruno, George W. Neuner and Brian M. Gaff for Cellectricon AB and Gyros AB added. Attorney Robert H. Stier, Jr; Michael J. Sullivan; Sean L. Sweeney; Tracy M. Clements and Kenneth E. Keller terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010) Modified on 2/2/2010 (jg, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 2/4/2010 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Howard on Behalf of Defendant Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. (Howard, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 counsel posted document selecting plaintiff as the filer creating a link between attorney Howard and plaintiff (dhm, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENTS NOS. 5,376,252, 7,390,650, 7,470,518, AND 7,563,614, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Filed byCellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (part one), #4 Exhibit 3 (part two), #5 Exhibit 4 (part one), #6 Exhibit 4 (part two))(Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 19, 2010 Filing 43 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Nathaniel Bruno NOTICE OF RE-SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON (Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER #41 re Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File First Amended Complaint and Defendant's Response. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/10/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
November 23, 2009 Filing 41 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File First Amended Complaint and Defendant's Response by Cellectricon AB. (Keller, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean L. Sweeney. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Sullivan. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert H. Stier, Jr. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER #28 Granting Substitution of Counsel, Attorney Tracy M. Clements,Robert H. Stier, Jr,Michael J. Sullivan,Sean L. Sweeney for Cellectricon AB and Gyros AB added. Attorney Brian M. Gaff; George W. Neuner; Neil Arthur Smith; Nathaniel Bruno and David G. Conlin terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/17/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER #35 Re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Potential Discovery Regarding Willfulness, Motions terminated: #26 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc., #23 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 13, 2009 Filing 35 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Potential Discovery Regarding Willfulness by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Keller, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 34 Proposed Order re #33 APPLICATION of Michael J. Sullivan for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611006287) by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Michael J. Sullivan for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611006287) filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 32 Proposed Order re #31 APPLICATION of Robert H. Stier, Jr. for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611006287) by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 31 APPLICATION of Robert H. Stier, Jr. for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611006287) filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 30 Proposed Order re #29 APPLICATION of Sean L. Sweeney for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611006287) by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 29 APPLICATION of Sean L. Sweeney for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611006287) filed by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kenneth E. Keller (Keller, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. re #26 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For More Definite Statement filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc. re #23 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 24 Proposed Order re #23 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER #21 for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/17/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FLUXION BIOSCIENCES TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Eric Lance Wesenberg and [Proposed] Order (Wesenberg, Eric) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/21/09. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 19, 2009 Filing 17 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Chin, Roger) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 12, 2009 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE of Consent/Declination due: 8/19/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of George W. Neuner (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of David G. Conlin (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENTS NOS. 5,376,252, 7,390,650, 7,470,518, AND 7,563,614, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. Filed byCellectricon AB, Gyros AB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (Part One), #4 Exhibit 3 (Part Two), #5 Exhibit 4)(Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 21, 2009 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (Chin, Roger) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 11 [Proposed] Order Granting re #10 Application for Admission of AttorneyPro Hac Vice Submitted by Plaintiffs Cellectricon AB & Gyros AB. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Attorney David G. Conlin for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice -[Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611034416] Filed by PlaintiffsCellectricon AB & Gyros AB. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 9 [Proposed] Order Granting re #8 Application for Admission of AttorneyPro Hac Vice Submitted by Plaintiffs Cellectricon AB & Gyros AB. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Attorney George W. Neuner for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice -[Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611034416] Filed by Plaintiffs Cellectricon AB & Gyros AB. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cellectricon AB, Gyros AB re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND RELATED DOCUMENTS ON DEFENDANT FLUXION BIOSCIENCES, INC. (Bruno, Nathaniel) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 6 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent Infringement of U.S. Patents Nos. 5,376252, 7,390,650 & 7,470,518. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons Filed by Plaintiffs Cellectricon AB & Gyros AB. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Filed by Plaintiffs Cellectricon AB & Gyros AB. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 10/27/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 11/3/2009 at 10:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement of U.S. Patents Nos. 5,376,252; 7,390,650 & 7,470,518 & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Fluxion Biosciences, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611034272] Filed by Plaintiffs Cellectricon AB & Gyros AB. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2009: #1 Exhibits 1 - 2) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2009: #2 Exhibit 3) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2009: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tn, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellectricon AB et al v. Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellectricon AB
Represented By: Brian M. Gaff
Represented By: David G. Conlin
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Michael J. Sullivan
Represented By: Neil Arthur Smith
Represented By: Robert H. Stier, Jr.
Represented By: Sean L. Sweeney
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Represented By: George W Neuner,
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Lael D. Andara
Represented By: Nathaniel Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gyros AB
Represented By: Brian M. Gaff
Represented By: David G. Conlin
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Neil Arthur Smith
Represented By: Sean L. Sweeney
Represented By: George W Neuner,
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Lael D. Andara
Represented By: Michael J. Sullivan
Represented By: Nathaniel Bruno
Represented By: Robert H. Stier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluxion Biosciences, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Lance Wesenberg
Represented By: Roger J. Chin
Represented By: Deakin Thomas Lauer,
Represented By: Deborah E. Fishman
Represented By: Elizabeth A Howard
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Love
Represented By: Kaycie Lynn Wall
Represented By: Kenneth John Halpern
Represented By: Ron Eleazer Shulman
Represented By: Salumeh R Loesch
Represented By: Siddhartha M. Venkatesan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?