Brown et al v. Wal-Mart Store, Inc.

Plaintiff: Nisha Brown and Kathy Williamson
Defendant: WAL-MART STORE, INC.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03339
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT BETWEEN SETTLEMENT CLASS PLAINTIFFS AND WAL-MART STORES, INC. 296 297 298 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/28/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Order by Judge Edward J. Davila Denying 192 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 226 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Denying 239 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 245 Motion for Sanctions. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Order by Judge Edward J. Davila Granting in Part and Denying in Part 213 Motion for Sanctions.(mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING 189 DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/9/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Denying as Moot 115 Motion to Facilitate Class Notice as; Granting 117 Motion to Stay. This action is STAYED in its entirety pending resolution of Defendant's Rule 23(f) petition, and if the petition is granted, Defendant's Nint h Circuit appeal. The parties shall provide notice to the court within one week of any disposition of Defendant's Rule 23(f) petition. If the petition is granted, the parties shall also provide notice to the court within one week of any disposit ion of Defendant's Ninth Circuit appeal. Plaintiff's Motion to Facilitate Class Notice is DENIED as moot. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this matter. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012) Modified text on 11/15/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 81 MOTION for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 24, 2012. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 91 Stipulation. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for September 9, 2011, is hereby VACATED. The court will reschedule the conference in its order on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification *** 9/9/2011 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/26/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER MODIFYING 58 SCHEDULING ORDER FILED NOVEMBER 12, 2010 AND CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification August 5, 2011; Deadline for Filing Opposition to Motion for Class Certification August 19, 2011; Dea dline for Filing Reply to Motion for Class Certification August 26, 2011; Deadline for Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement August 30, 2011; Hearing on Motion for Class Certification and Preliminary Pretrial Conference September 9, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. and 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/5/2011. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT RESOLVING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL [DKT. NO. 21] AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF [DKT. NO. 65, 72] AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [DKT. 69] re 73 Stipulation. Motions terminated: 72 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge Grewal Dated January 28, 2011 [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #65] filed by WAL-MART STORE, INC., 69 MOTION for Reconsideration re 68 Order on Ex Parte Application MOTION for Reconsideration re 68 Order on Ex Parte Application filed by WAL-MART STORE, INC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISSOLVING STAY AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 21 Motion for Discovery (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In light of the modification of the Case Schedule and pending Motion, the Court finds that a Preliminary Pretrial Conference would be premature at this time. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the Decem ber 13 Conference to June 27, 2011 at 11 a.m. On or before June 17, 2011, the parties shall file a Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement including, among other things, a good faith proposed schedule for trial and an update on any settlement efforts. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER DATED JANUARY 18, 2010 IN LIGHT OF COURT'S MAY 5, 2010 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY re 55 Stipulation. Deadline to File Class Certification Motion due by 5/23/2011. Opposition due by 6/6/2011. Reply due by 6/13/2011. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 21 Staying Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/11/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Modify ADR Deadline re 29 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 26 by Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/22/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/1/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Modification to ADR Deadline re 19 Stipulation. ENE Deadline set for 5/10/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified text on 3/12/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation re 12 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 1/11/2010 to 2/1/2010 re 9 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 1/22/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Wal-Mart Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nisha Brown
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Williamson
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORE, INC.
Represented By: Marlene S. Muraco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?