Ortiz et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Plaintiff: Gabriel Ortiz, Andrew Gonzales, Landon Mickey Miller and Joe Huynh
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Case Number: 5:2009cv03485
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/2/2012. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 76 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on October 5, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER TO SUPPLEMENT EXHIBIT TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT 74 . Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on September 27, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Stipulated Request for Extension of Time to File Class Action Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/13/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 65 Stipulation filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/1/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Staying Pretrial Schedule Deadlines through August 31, 2011 Pursuant to Parties' Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/7/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Approving Stipulated Extension. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/17/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Approving Stipulation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/25/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Approving Stipulation re Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/22/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice signed August 13, 2010 by Judge Lucy H. Koh (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Complete Private ADR re 34 Stipulation. Mediation deadline due 12/15/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, re 16 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/18/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Extension of Time to File Answer to FAC by 1/8/2010 re 11 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Ortiz
Represented By: Rachael Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Gonzales
Represented By: Rachael Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landon Mickey Miller
Represented By: Rachael Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Huynh
Represented By: Rachael Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?