Price v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Click Fraud case against Facebook

Plaintiff: Steven Price
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03519
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/19/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
October 22, 2009 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( 12 ). Case reassigned to District Judge Jeremy Fogel for all furhter proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Judge Ronald M. Whyte no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE RELATION AND CONSOLIDATION OF CASES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 23, 2009 Filing 11 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
August 28, 2009 Filing 10 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 Filing 9 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 10 . *** STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time by Facebook, Inc.. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/28/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2009 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Price of Summons & Complaint (Grombacher, Kiley) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION to Relate Case /ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Steven Price. (Harnett, Melissa) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 08/10/09. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 10, 2009 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Avalos, Julio) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/10/2009 (bw, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2009 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 54611005704 by plaintiff. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
July 31, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2009. Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2009 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order re Initial Case Management and Discovery Disputes Judge Lloyd, # 2 San Jose Judges Standing Orders, # 3 Standing Order for all Judges of the Northern District of California) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages, Restitution, Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Relief (Summons Issued); jury demand (Fee Due) against Facebook, Inc. Filed by Steven Price. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Price
Represented By: Gregory Bernard Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?