Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. v. Chipmos Technologies Inc
Plaintiff: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Defendant: ChipMOS Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03689
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/6/2013 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2013. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/24/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 244 . Settlement Conference set for 6/20/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/17/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE. This action is referred to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins for a settlement conference to occur no later than 6/28/2013. The Clerk shall reassign this case to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. All matters previously scheduled before District Judge Edward J. Davila are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/15/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING 222 STIPULATION re 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of ChipMOS' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by ChipMOS Technologies, Inc. Motions terminated: 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of ChipMOS' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by ChipMOS Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/13/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting 183 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting 186 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/25/2013. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 *** PURSUANT TO ORDER 216 , DOCUMENT REMOVED *** ORDER granting 183 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 186 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/24/2013.(ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013) Modified text on 1/24/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 215 replaced on 1/25/2013) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2013 (sp, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. The 1/18/2013 Preliminary Pretrial conference is continued to 3/8/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Updated Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 2/26/2013. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/15/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Due to the court's unavailability, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled to 1/18/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. ***12/7/2012 Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER TERMINATING 124 MOTION TO STRIKE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/30/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER APPROVING 158 STIPULATED REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE CHIPMOS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/6/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER (1) GRANTING 82 FREESCALE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND (2) DENYING 100 CHIPMOS'S CROSS-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 122 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/12/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER APPROVING 96 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CHIPMOS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/14/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY re 74 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JOINT SCHEDULING ORDER re 69 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/1/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER CONTINUING SEPTEMBER 3, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (granting 62 ). The Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2010 is CONTINUED to 11/19/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/31/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FREESCALE TO FILE ITS REPLY BRIEF re 54 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/2/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME FOR CHIPMOS' TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 50 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/18/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 46 For Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/3/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER CLARIFYING STAY (re 45 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 9 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND TO STAY LITIGATION OF PATENT-RELATED ISSUES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 28 ). The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2010 are CONTINUED to 3/5/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 18 , Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER APPROVING 14 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. The Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2010 is CONTINUED to 2/19/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. v. Chipmos Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChipMOS Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Shanee Y. W. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?