Orange County Electricial Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Stone Electric No. 2, Inc
Plaintiff: Orange County Electricial Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Local Union No. 441 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and Douglas Chappell
Defendant: Stone Electric No. 2, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03725
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 Stipulation, filed by Local Union No. 441 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Orange County Electricial Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Douglas Chappell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/6/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 Joint Motion to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2010 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/25/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Case Management Statement. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2010 at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2, 5th floor. An updated joint statement is due no later than 2/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/25/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orange County Electricial Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Stone Electric No. 2, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orange County Electricial Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union No. 441 of the International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Chappell
Represented By: Benjamin Kerl Lunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Electric No. 2, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?