Yieldboost Technologies, Inc. v. Photon Dynamics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yieldboost Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Photon Dynamics, Inc. and Orbotech, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv03828
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND UNCONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 89 GRANTING THIRD REQUEST TO EXTEND 30 DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE 87 GRANTING SECOND REQUEST TO EXTEND 30 DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/18/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE: 85 GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND 30-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 to Shorten Time for Hearing on Yieldboost's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/8/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 76 TO ENLARGE TIME FOR SERVING INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/7/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 Changing Time Pursuant to L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 42 REQUEST FOR ORDER ENLARGING TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/22/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010).
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 32 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/15/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yieldboost Technologies, Inc. v. Photon Dynamics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yieldboost Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J.M. Prebeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Photon Dynamics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orbotech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?