Mach-T3 Engineering, LLC v. BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP
Plaintiff: Mach-T3 Engineering, LLC
Defendant: BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP
Case Number: 5:2009cv03886
Filed: August 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/22/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 20 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff to file amended pleading as a new docket entry forthwith. Response to amended complaint to be made in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(3). (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER vacating motion hearing re 20 plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint. 3/2/2010 motion hearing vacated. Matter deemed submitted on the papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/26/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER 25 extending ADR deadline. Deadline for completing ADR: 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/17/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Deadline for ADR session: 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/19/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mach-T3 Engineering, LLC v. BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mach-T3 Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Robert Edward Nuddleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE Systems Land & Armaments LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?