Hernandez v. Rickenbacker Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victor M. Hernandez
Defendant: Rickenbacker Group, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,
Case Number: 5:2009cv03970
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice re 25 Stipulation. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT re 21 Certification of Mediation Session. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/21/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Show Cause Response due by 6/11/2010. ***Pretrial and Trial Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 18 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/28/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 16 Letter filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,, 17 Letter filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 30, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 13 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/22/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Rickenbacker Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor M. Hernandez
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickenbacker Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?