Green Valley Corporation v. Caldo Oil Company et al
Plaintiff: Green Valley Corporation
Defendant: Caldo Oil Company and Nella Oil Company, LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv04028
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERENCE FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES 15-cv-02296 NC and 09-cv-04028 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/22/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/16/2011. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Regarding Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/9/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 148 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWL OF EXPERT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/16/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 137 Motion to Shorten Time (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion to Compel; denying 121 Motion in Limine. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Denying Requested Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/29/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Koh granting 74 Motion for Leave to File. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Defendant's two cross complaints and Plaintiff's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Koh on 4/7/2011. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER UPON 76 STIPULATION BY PARTIES REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. APRIL 13, 2011 MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE IS VACATED. April 13, 2011 CMC is continued to April 21, 2011 at 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/24/2011. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Approving Stipulation for Private ADR. New ADR Deadline is April 12, 2011. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/7/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (lhklc2, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Regarding Mediation. Parties Must Submit Any Revised ADR Stipulation by 2/4/2011. Mediation Deadline of 3/17/2011 Remains in Place. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/31/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 49 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 51 Motion to fix attorneys' fees as an item of costs pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 6972(e) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Vacating December 9, 2010 Motion Hearing on 49 and 51 . The December 9, 2010 Case Management Conference remains as set. Signed by Judge Koh on 12/6/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Regarding Additional Case Management Statement Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/06/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Regarding Consenting to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/04/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed on 08/18/2010 by Judge Lucy H. Koh. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE RESPONSE AND INITIAL DISCLOSURES FILING DEADLINE TO FRIDAY JULY 16, 2010 re 38 . Signed by Judge Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/30/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Judge Jeremy Fogel. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING 28 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2010 is CONTINUED to 4/16/2010 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/24/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Valley Corporation v. Caldo Oil Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Valley Corporation
Represented By: John Richard Till
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caldo Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nella Oil Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?