Ultra Products, Inc. v. Antec, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ultra Products, Inc.
Defendant: Channel Well Technology Co. Ltd., SPI Electronic Co. Ltd., Sea Sonic Electronics Co. Ltd., Thermaltake Technology Co. Ltd. and Topower Computer Industrial Co. Ltd.
Consol Defendant: Enermax Technology Corporation
Consol CounterDft: Ultra Products, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Antec, Inc., Channel Well Technology Co. Ltd., FSP Group USA Corp., Mushkin, Inc., Sea Sonic Electronics Co. Ltd., SPI Electronic Co. Ltd., Tagan Technology Co., Thermaltake Technology Co. Ltd., Thermaltake, Inc., Topower Computer Industrial Co. Ltd., Topower Computer U.S.A., Inc. and E-Power Technology/PCMCIS
Counter-defendant: Ultra Products, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2009cv04255
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/4/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER MODIFYING ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/20/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 426 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT RE 425 Stipulation, filed by Streak Products Inc, Case stayed.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/30/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 424 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/7/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 12/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg . Jury Trial set for 12/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER RE 390 Concerning Physical Evidence Submitted in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/26/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CHANGE TIME UNDER CIVIL L.R. 6-3 RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER RE: 375 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/30/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER RE: 363 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/11. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 335 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/29/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER RE: 305 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER GRANTING 304 Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions; GRANTING 309 Request for Judicial Notice; and DENYING AS MOOT 331 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 09/08/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 321 INTERIM ORDER re 304 . Defendants shall file declarations as to their diligence within 10 days of this order, and Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the date Defendants file such declarations to then file any response thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/11/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER re 296 Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney; Attorneys Jen-Feng Lee and Kenneth K. Tanji, Jr. added for Thermaltake Technology Co. Ltd., Thermaltake Inc.; Attorneys On Lu; Daniel S. Mount; Kevin Martin Pasquinelli; Kathryn G. Spelman; Daniel H. Fingerman and Ruby I-Chieh Ho terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/2/10. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER RE: 262 , 268 DENYING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/26/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER RE: 276 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MARY O. LOVETT PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/21/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2010.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/5/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ultra Products, Inc. v. Antec, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ultra Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Fuming Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channel Well Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPI Electronic Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Sonic Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermaltake Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topower Computer Industrial Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol defendant: Enermax Technology Corporation
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol counterdft: Ultra Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Fuming Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Antec, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Channel Well Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: FSP Group USA Corp.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Mushkin, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Martin Pasquinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Sea Sonic Electronics Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: SPI Electronic Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Tagan Technology Co.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Thermaltake Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Thermaltake, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Topower Computer Industrial Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Topower Computer U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: E-Power Technology/PCMCIS
Represented By: Kathryn G. Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Ultra Products, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Fuming Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?