Allen v. Apple, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan et al
Plaintiff: Laura Allen
Defendant: Apple, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan and Cigna Group Insurance
Case Number: 5:2009cv04459
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 39 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MAY 7, 2010 AND SCHEDULING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 37 ). Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE CROSS-MOTION, REPLY AND SURREPLY FOR PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT re 28 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/31/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STANDARD OF REVIEW AND DISCOVERY re 15 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/15/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 12 , Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/4/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Apple, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Allen
Represented By: Cassie Springer-Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?