Rasheed v. Board of Parole of the United States
Petitioner: Tahee Abd Rasheed
Respondent: Board of Parole of the United States
Case Number: 5:2009cv04651
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING ISSUANCE OF A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/10. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/22/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Transferring Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/25/09. (Hellings, J)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Dismissing Ground Two of the 20 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 09/23/2009. (Flores, E)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING Petitioner Leave to File an Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/15/2009. Amended Complaint Due 7/20/2009. (Sant Agata, S)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Authorizing In Forma Pauperis Status, signed by Magistrate Judge William M. Wunderlich on 11/18/2008. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasheed v. Board of Parole of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tahee Abd Rasheed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Parole of the United States
Represented By: Mark Joseph McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?