Carnero et al v. EMC Mortgage Corp (EMC) et al
Plaintiff: Joser R Carnero and Marta C Carnero
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corp (EMC), Chase Bank, NationaL Default Servicing Corporation (NDSC), Real Time Resolutions, Inc. and Randy Miguel
Case Number: 5:2009cv04696
Filed: October 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 41 , 42 MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 23 , 25 MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 35 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND DENYING 19 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 10 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/27/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 3 Plaintiffs' Request re Notice of Lis Pendens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/21/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carnero et al v. EMC Mortgage Corp (EMC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joser R Carnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta C Carnero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corp (EMC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NationaL Default Servicing Corporation (NDSC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Time Resolutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Miguel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?