Nguyen-Phouc v. Aramark Corporation
Plaintiff: Albert Nguyen-Phouc
Defendant: Aramark Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv04879
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Dismissal with Prejudice. The Clerk shall close this file re 21 Stipulation. ***Hearing/Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statement due by 6/18/2010. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2010 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Modification to ADR Deadline re 15 Stipulation. ENE deadline extended to 5/20/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Aramark Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/20/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen-Phouc v. Aramark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Nguyen-Phouc
Represented By: Steven Paul Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Corporation
Represented By: Melinda S. Riechert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?