Zambrano v. Cullen
Petitioner: Enrique Zambrano
Respondent: Vincent Cullen and Robert K. Wong
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project, Michael David Laurence and Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Case Number: 5:2009cv04917
Filed: October 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Failure to Exhaust State Remedies Replies due by 7/30/2014. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER RE REPLY BRIEF Reply brief due 6/2/14 to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/2/14. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE OVERSIZE BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/24/14. (mpbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Failure to Exhaust State Remedies Responses due by 12/4/2013. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Complete Exhaustion Review (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zambrano v. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Enrique Zambrano
Represented By: Teresa Anne Hampton
Represented By: Oliver Winston Loewy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: California Appellate Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Michael David Laurence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Habeas Corpus Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vincent Cullen
Represented By: Gregory A. Ott
Represented By: Donna Marie Provenzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert K. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?