McNallen v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Teri L McNallen
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2009cv05084
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to prosecute. Case dismissed without prejudice. Clerk to close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/25/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 2/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/19/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 substitution of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNallen v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri L McNallen
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?