Huang v. Bell et al
Plaintiff: Yong Tan Huang
Defendant: Tim Bell and Gayle Bell
Case Number: 5:2009cv05099
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING 84 , 85 , 89 , 90 MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED ON APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF APPELLATE COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/3/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER RE 75 , 76 DOCUMENTS FILED ON APRIL 6, 2010. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING 57 , 70 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/24/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PAY FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/7/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Case Be Reassigned along with Report and Recommendation That Case Be Dismissed Without Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/6/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong Tan Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?