Abstrax, Inc. v. Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Abstrax, Inc.
Defendant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Abstrax, Inc.
Mediator: Paul M Janicke
Case Number: 5:2009cv05243
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER ON STIPULATED DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED SCHEDULE re 278 Notice (Other) filed by Abstrax, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/12/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 273 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/13/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER requiring lead counsel for all parties to engage in an in-person meet and confer regarding the pending 216 discovery disputes and 218 motion for sanctions by close of business June 14, 2011. Lead counsel may participate in the meet and conf er by telephone. The parties shall file a single joint letter limited to five (5) pages by close of business June 16, 2011 informing the Court of the status of the in-person meet and confer. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on June 8, 2011. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER requiring Plaintiff Abstrax, Inc. to file a motion to seal 226 its opposition to Defendant's motion for a protective order by close of business Monday, June 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on June 2, 2011. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER REGARDING 221 BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND 220 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on May 16, 2011. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER re 214 Stipulation filed by Abstrax, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/2/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE THE DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION re 211 Stipulation filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/1/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 209 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/9/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 196 Motion for Protective Order; granting 197 Motion to Compel (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER ON BRIEFING DATES FOR DISCOVERY MOTIONS re 193 Stipulation filed by Sun Microsystems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/9/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Parties' Stipulated request to reschedule the Case Management Conference is GRANTED. Case Management Conference is rescheduled for 4/8/2010 02:00 PM re 185 Stipulation filed by Abstrax, Inc., Sun Microsystems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/18/2010. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/9/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Court grants motion for transfer to the Northern District of California. In light of the transfer of venue, theCourt suspends any and all pending deadlines as indicated in the Docket Control Order. Likewise, the Court suspends any deadline under the Local Rules for responding to pending motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/28/09. (ehs, )
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - This memorandum opinion resolves the parties' disputes over the scope of the claims as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/31/08. (ehs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abstrax, Inc. v. Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abstrax, Inc.
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Represented By: James Michael Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Abstrax, Inc.
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Paul M Janicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?