Gardias v. The California State University, San Jose State University
Plaintiff: Piotr J. Gardias
Defendant: The California State University, San Jose State University
Case Number: 5:2009cv05291
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Dismissing Consolidated Action. Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/23/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting (19) defendant's Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (15), (26) plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaints; and (3) Setting Case Management Conference. Cases consolidated under common case number C09-05291HRL, and all future filings to be made exclusively in that case. Clerk shall administratively terminate Case Nos. C09-05611HRL, C10-03437HRL, C10-05637HRL, and C11-03196HRL. Plaintiff's motion to amend granted, and identified claims and allegations are dismissed. Case management conference set for 4/3/2012, 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2. Joint case management statement due by 3/27/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting Defendant's Request to Vacate Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/5/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 69 plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 70 defendant's Motion for Sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 64 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 32 , 41 and 42 plaintiff's motions for disclosure and motion for sanctions. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 34 (1) granting defendant's request to vacate current case management deadlines and (2) continuing hearing on 32 plaintiff's motion for sanctions. Summary judgment hearing deadline, pretrial conference and trial dates vacated. Hearing on plaintiff's motion for sanctions continued to 8/31/2010, 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/20/2010. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying without prejudice 20 plaintiff's motion to compel. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Re-Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Case management conference set for 4/13/2010, 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2. All deadlines set in Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines (Docket No. 3) adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/16/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re: 09-02090. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/9/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/9/2009 (rslc2, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardias v. The California State University, San Jose State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piotr J. Gardias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The California State University, San Jose State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?