Hsich v. Stanford University et al
Plaintiff: Fang-Yuh Hsich
Defendant: Stanford University, Eric K Shinscki and Philip Lavori
Case Number: 5:2009cv05455
Filed: November 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 189 Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Costs. The 6/14/2011 hearing is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/7/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 JUDGMENT. The Court having granted Defendants' respective motions for summary judgment (and having denied Plaintiff's motions for the same) in their entirety, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT judgment be entered in favor of Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/20/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against Defendant Stanford University; and WITHDRAWING 91 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions against the Federal Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/5/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING (1) 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, (2) 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery, and (3) 76 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Stanford University to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/15/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 . The hearing on Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to complete discovery and motion for leave to file a fourth amended complaint, currently set for 11/30/2010, is CONTINUED to 12/7/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants' oppositions are due by 11/16/2010, and Plaintiff's reply is due by 11/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/9/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/03/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hsich v. Stanford University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fang-Yuh Hsich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K Shinscki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Lavori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?