Surf and Sand, LLC v. City Of Capitola et al
Plaintiff: Surf and Sand, LLC
Defendant: City Of Capitola, Bob Begun, Sam Storey, Ronald Graves, Kirny A Nicol and Dennis Norton
Case Number: 5:2009cv05542
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STANDBY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/12/2011 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2011. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/30/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF DISCOVERY AND MOTION DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS re 83 Proposed Order filed by Surf and Sand, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 11, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF SURF & SAND'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Compel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FILING OF FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND DEEMING COMPLAINT AMENDED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/13/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE JOINT SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/23/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: 8 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/9/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: 15 CONTINUING HEARING AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/08/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: 8 CONTINUING HEARING AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Hearing on motion to dismiss continued from 02/3/2010 to 03/11/2010 in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, U.S. District Court, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surf and Sand, LLC v. City Of Capitola et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surf and Sand, LLC
Represented By: C. William Dahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Capitola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Begun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirny A Nicol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?