Lum v. Scitor Corporation
Plaintiff: Wayne Lum
Defendant: Scitor Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv05828
Filed: December 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 32 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/24/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 8/6/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MEDIATION DEADLINE re 27 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/11/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 18 , Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/5/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 10 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/6/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lum v. Scitor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Lum
Represented By: Mark C. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scitor Corporation
Represented By: Tianjing Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?