Barroso v. OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Barroso
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC and Western Progressive, LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv05904
Filed: December 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 29, 2010. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF SANDRA BARROSO TO ENGAGE COUNSEL, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on September 30, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISSOLVING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on July 29, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2010 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 7, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/23/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on February 11, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE EITHER A "CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE," OR ELSE A "DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT." Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on January 4, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barroso v. OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Barroso
Represented By: Wendell Jamon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?