Baba v. Hewlett Packard Company
Plaintiff: David Baba
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Company
Case Number: 5:2009cv05946
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER SCHEDULING BRIEFING AND CONTINUING HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 . MOTION for Summary Judgment.Responses due by 9/20/2012. Replies due by 10/4/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/6/2012. (fritzeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 93 ENLARGMENT OF TIME RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' ANTICIPATED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ENLARGEMENT OF TIME RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' ANTICIPATED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re 81 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/31/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 71 plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order.(hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 83 ENLARGMENT OF TIME RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' ANTICIPATED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE 59 CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE: 56 SETTING TIME FOR DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY TO ANSWER THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OR TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ANY THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE: 47 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE 45 SETTING DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: 21 DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/16/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: 16 GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BARBARA QUINN SMITH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/16/2010 (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 6 EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 02/09/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baba v. Hewlett Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Baba
Represented By: Scott Richard Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?