York v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Reginald R. York
Defendant: J. Hernandez, N. Grannnis, Debbie Wikoff and Suzan Hubbard
Case Number: 5:2009cv06080
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/9/2012 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; case settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 8/16/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference reset for 7/23/2012 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 205, 2nd Floor, Eureka before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/20/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/24/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 205, 2nd Floor, Eureka before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/14/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/7/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 205, 2nd Floor, Eureka before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 06/06/12. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER vacating settlement conference, requiring meet and confer, and setting status conference. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 , order setting settlement conference. Settlement conference set for December 19, 2011, is vacated. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/15/11. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying Plaintiff's request to reschedule setttlement conference. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 40 Order Setting Settlement Conference, 41 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement conference vacated due to Plaintiff's SHU status. Settlement conference will be reset at Corcoran State Prison. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald R. York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Grannnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Wikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzan Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?