Nationwide Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company and First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 5:2010cv00027
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; FINDING AS MOOT REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 14 Status Report. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Case Management Statement or Stipulated Dismissal due by 7/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Dismiss of Individual Defendants Ace American Insurance Company and Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company re 12 Notice (Other). Ace American Insurance Company and Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 6 Letter, filed by Nationwide Mutual Life Insurance Company. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/21/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 4 Letter filed by Nationwide Mutual Life Insurance Company. Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2010 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin K. Cholakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?