Adamian v. Bank of America , N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Adamian
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Bank of America , N.A. and First American Loanstar Trustee Services LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv00049
Filed: January 6, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting-in-Part Motion to Dismiss 22 and Remanding; finding as moot 5 and 7 Motions to Dismiss.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 30 ). The Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2010 is CONTINUED to 11/5/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 16 , Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/14/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE (approving 13 ). The Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2010 is CONTINUED to 6/25/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adamian v. Bank of America , N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Donald John Querio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Represented By: Jon David Ives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Loanstar Trustee Services LLC
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Adamian
Represented By: James R Cracolice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?