Garcia v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bernabe Garcia
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00148
Filed: January 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE: 7 , 9 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/23/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/9/2010 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/29/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/19/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 03/09/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernabe Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Vanessa Anne Sunshine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?