Hansen v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Karen Hansen
Defendant: Safeway, Inc. and Anthony Castro
Case Number: 5:2010cv00377
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/23/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STANDBY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2010 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 11/24/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/3/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE: 21 16 JURY TRIAL DEMAND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/22/2010,(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hansen
Represented By: Kenneth Jeffrey Kroopf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: James Steven Greenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Castro
Represented By: James Steven Greenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?