Markowitz et al v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Eric Markowitz, Frank Blumenthal, Lauren Reese and Billy Stern
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00430
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/3/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES AND PERMITTING FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT re 5 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/11/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 6 Motion to Relate Case (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 9, 2010 Filing 8 Memorandum in Opposition re 6 MOTION Relation of Cases Administrative Motion Defendant Facebooks Opposition To Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related; [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 7 Proposed Order re 6 MOTION Relation of Cases Administrative Motion by Frank Blumenthal, Eric Markowitz, Lauren Reese, Billy Stern. (Lake, David) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION Relation of Cases Administrative Motion filed by Frank Blumenthal, Eric Markowitz, Lauren Reese, Billy Stern. (Lake, David) (Filed on 2/5/2010) Modified on 2/8/2010 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 Filing 5 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Cases for all Purposes and Permitting Filing of Consolidated Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 2, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE by Frank Blumenthal, Eric Markowitz, Lauren Reese, Billy Stern of Related Cases (Lake, David) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 29, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 JF Standing Order re Pretrial Preparation, # 2 Standing Order)(gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc.. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010) (gm, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2010 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 44611004739.). Filed byEric Markowitz, Frank Blumenthal, Billy Stern, Lauren Reese. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markowitz et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Markowitz
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Blumenthal
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Reese
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Stern
Represented By: David Nathan Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?