PixArt Imaging, Inc v. Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd., Inc et al
Plaintiff: PixArt Imaging, Inc
Defendant: Avago Technologies ECBU IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd.,Inc, Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd., Inc and Avago Technologies USA, Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv00544
Filed: February 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART re 109 Stipulation, filed by Avago Technologies USA, Inc, Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd., Inc, Avago Technologies ECBU IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd.,Inc Joint Preliminary Pretrial Con fernce Statement due by 2/17/2012. Last day to hear Dispositive Motions set for 3/12/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/27/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re 109 Stipulation, filed by Avago Technologies USA, Inc, Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd., Inc, Avago Technologies ECBU IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd.,Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 26, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER CONTINUING 10/17/11 HEARING TO 10/31/11, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 72 MOTION to Strike, 76 MOTION to Strike 67 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PUBLIC VERSION of Notice of Motion and Motion to Preclude or Strike Testim ony of Joseph J. Egan MOTION to Strike 67 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PUBLIC VERSION of Notice of Motion and Motion to Preclude or Strike Testimony of Joseph J. Egan. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 49 and 50 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/15/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Amend Case Schedule re 45 Stipulation. Close of Fact Discovery 6/22/2011. Close of Expert Discovery Discovery due by 8/12/2011. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2011. Preliminary Pretri al Conference statement due 8/19/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/29/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO AMEND THE CASE SCHEDULE re 43 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AS AMENDED BY THE COURT re 39 Stipulation filed by Avago Technologies ECBU IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd.,Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 06/30/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT EXTENDING TIME FOR RESPONSE re 12 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PixArt Imaging, Inc v. Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd., Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies ECBU IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd.,Inc
Represented By: Cliff Allan Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte.Ltd., Inc
Represented By: Cliff Allan Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avago Technologies USA, Inc
Represented By: Cliff Allan Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PixArt Imaging, Inc
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?