Natus Medical Incorporated v. Intelligent Hearing System
Plaintiff: Natus Medical Incorporated
Defendant: Intelligent Hearing System
Case Number: 5:2010cv00707
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER 49 Granting Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/18/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS AMENDED BY THE COURT re 45 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/16/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER 21 Selecting ADR Process, Case Referred to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/6/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 Stipulation filed by Intelligent Hearing System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/15/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natus Medical Incorporated v. Intelligent Hearing System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natus Medical Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Robert Re
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intelligent Hearing System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?