Sun v. Rickenbacker Collections
Plaintiff: Zhixun Samuel Sun
Defendant: Rickenbacker Collections
Case Number: 5:2010cv01055
Filed: March 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER finding as moot 61 Motion for Entry of Default; finding as moot 62 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 64 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on January 2, 2013. (ejdlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Koh on 2/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of mailing)(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 28 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Rickenbacker Collections. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/11/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun v. Rickenbacker Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickenbacker Collections
Represented By: June D. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhixun Samuel Sun
Represented By: Jan Elizabeth VanDusen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?