Gens v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Laura Gens
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, World Savings Bank, FSB, Wachovia Mortgage, FSB and Golden West Savings Association Service, Co
Case Number: 5:2010cv01073
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER STAYING MOTION TO REMAND 14 AND MOTION FOR JOINDER 13 ; DENYING AS MOOT WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS 10 . Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 8, 2013. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Setting Hearings. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/05/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/14/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying (89) Motion for Attorney Fees without prejudice in case 5:10-cv-01073-LHK.Associated Cases: 5:10-cv-01073-LHK, 5:12-cv-05947-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO JUDGE LUCY H. KOH FOR CONSIDERATION OF RELATED CASE STATUS. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), the above-entitled action is referred to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh for a determination as to whether this case is related to Gens v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, Case No. 5:10-cv-01073 LHK, an action currently pending before Judge Koh. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2012. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 73 Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees. The September 1, 2011 motion hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/30/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order Granting in Part 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Koh on 7/7/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying 78 Motion to Stay; Granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/15/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 73 Defendants' Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Koh on 6/1/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice; Denying 67 Motion to Strike as Moot. The May 12, 2011 motion hearing is vacated. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/10/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 49 Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and re 51 Denying Defendants' Motion to Strike as moot. Signed by Judge Koh on 1/3/2011. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of mailing)(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order Vacating December 9, 2010 Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Koh on 12/6/2010. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL RE 47 21 23 WACHOVIA'S APPLICATION FOR INSTRUCTIONS. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 37 WACHOVIA'S APPLICATION TO SUPPLEMENT ITS BRIEFING. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL 30 RE MEDIATION. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 5 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING ON REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE TO A DISTRICT COURT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/18/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gens v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings Bank, FSB
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden West Savings Association Service, Co
Represented By: Yaw-Jiun Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?