Ries et al v. Hornell Brewing Company, inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lauren Ries and Serena Algozer
Defendant: Hornell Brewing Company, Inc., Beverage Marketing U.S.A, Inc, AriZona Corp Inc., Palm Beach Brewing Co, LLC and Ferolito Vultaggio & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01139
Filed: March 17, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2013 203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 202 EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
March 28, 2013 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING MOTION TO DECERTIFY CLASS, AND DENYING MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 4, 2013 183 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING HEARING DATE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT OPINION. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/1/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
February 15, 2013 174 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DUE DATE FOR JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/15/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
January 14, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 170 CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS AND EXTENDING HEARING SCHEDULE FOR ALL PRETRIAL MOTIONS. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 10, 2012 163 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 162 EXTENDING HEARING SCHEDULE AND DUE DATE FOR ALL PRETRIAL MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 29, 2012 156 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2013 10:00 AM; Bench Trial set for 5/13/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/29/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
August 8, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 119 CONTINUING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/7/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
December 16, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 3/25/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
November 21, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 103 EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION SESSION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
September 8, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 93 Stipulation filed by Ferolito Vultaggio & Sons, Inc., Beverage Marketing U.S.A, Inc, Hornell Brewing Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 8, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 25, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 79 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/25/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 4, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER, re 82 Stipulation filed by Ferolito Vultaggio & Sons, Inc., Beverage Marketing U.S.A, Inc, Hornell Brewing Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/4/2011. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
June 15, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION SESSION re 78 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
April 4, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 62 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 4, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
December 13, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND DENYING 55 MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/13/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO THE UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/7/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
August 24, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO THE UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION re 51 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/23/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 23, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STAY AND TERMINATING 20 MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/23/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 1, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 37 , Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/28/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
May 28, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING NEW HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (approving 29 ). The Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/16/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/16/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/28/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ries et al v. Hornell Brewing Company, inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Ries
Represented By: George Richard Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena Algozer
Represented By: George Richard Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornell Brewing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverage Marketing U.S.A, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AriZona Corp Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Beach Brewing Co, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferolito Vultaggio & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?