Li v. A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc
Plaintiff: Guifu Li
Defendant: A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc
Case Number: 5:2010cv01189
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 537 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $12,587,726.90 against A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc., Minjian Hand Healing Institute, Inc., Huan Zou, Jun Ma. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 532 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/25/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 520 Motion for Default Judgment (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER Regarding Expert Report. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/11/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER Regarding Huan Zou's ECF Filer Status. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/24/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/23/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER Regarding Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/22/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 498 Motion (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 480 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 470 Motion (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER Adopting Notice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/11/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER Regarding Class Notice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/10/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER Regarding Notice to the Class. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/6/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Case Management ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/2/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/20/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 283 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 317 Motion for Sanctions; granting in part and denying in part 318 Motion for Summary Judgment (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER Resetting Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/12/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER Setting Telephonic Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/6/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER Adopting Publication Notice. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/29/2012. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 303 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER re 304 Notice (Other) filed by Fang Dai. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/22/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 277 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 278 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 279 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 281 Motion to Compel; granting 282 Motion to Compel; granting 284 Motion to Compel (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER and Stipulation to Enlarge Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/17/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Regarding Stipulation Enlarging Time to File. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/14/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER Setting Discovery Motion Hearing for 11/21/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/9/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part 272 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/18/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 235 Motion to Facilitate Collective Action; granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion to Certify Class(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Regarding Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/14/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh GRANTING 223 Motion to Compel; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 228 Motion for Sanctions (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER SETTING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/17/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/3/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion to Strike. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Granting Parties' Stipulation Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Class Certification Motion, as Modified. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/8/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Denying 154 Motion to Stay, Resetting Case Management Conference for June 17, 2011 at 1:30 p.m.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Approving Stipulation, As Modified. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/17/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Granting Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/12/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Regarding 2/25/2011 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/7/2011. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 35 Motion to Dismiss; denying 129 Motion for Sanctions. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011).
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting Stipulated Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/14/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration per Stipulation. Opposition Due December 8, 2010. Reply Due December 16, 2010. Hearing on January 27, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/5/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Declining to Impose Sanctions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/4/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010).
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 INTERIM ORDER re 112 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Inspection and Production. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/1/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part 23(d) Curative Measures, Denying Motion for Anonymity, Denying Motions to Seal, and Ordering Defendants to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should not Be Imposed.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDERING MEET AND CONFER REGARDING SELECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 09/13/2010. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 to Limit Discovery. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/30/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 47 Tentatively Finding Plaintiffs Motion Requesting Discovery re Arbitrability Moot. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/3/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 37 Motion to Shorten Time. Hearing set for 8/6/2010. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li v. A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Perfect Day Franchise, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guifu Li
Represented By: Adam Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?