Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Advent, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: Advent, Inc., Advent Companies, inc., Advent Construction Management, Global Premier Develoipment, Inc., Jerome Kielty, MIL Aspen Associates, L.P., Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, Landmark American Ins. Co, Navigator's Specialty Insurance Co, National Union Fire In. Co. of Pittsburgh, First Mercury Ins. Co and Majestic Ins. Co
Case Number: 5:2010cv01342
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Koh on 5/27/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER RE: MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/28/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Setting Hearing Date and Expedited Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2011 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/25/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER SEEKING CLARIFICATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Koh on 3/23/2011. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 88 Stipulation filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 12/1/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 Stipulation filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/24/10. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Landmark American Ins. Co without prejudice pursuant to 40 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Koh on 11/12/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 11 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem ad Litem. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Advent, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Sharon Wendell Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advent, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advent Companies, inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advent Construction Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Premier Develoipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Kielty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIL Aspen Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Ins. Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigator's Specialty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire In. Co. of Pittsburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Ins. Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majestic Ins. Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?