Cisco Systems, Inc. v. Hanson Information Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Hanson Information Systems, Inc., Kaen H Pletsch and Pusparaj Mohanty
Case Number: 5:2010cv01407
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 23 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/25/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING re: SETTLEMENT AND (2) VACTING ALL CURRENT FILING DEADLINES AND HEARINGS. The parties shall file a voluntary dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a) on or before 08/31/2010. If a dismissal is not filed by this date, plaint iff shall appear on 9/7/2010 10:00 AM and show cause, if any, why the case should not be dismissed. If a voluntary dismissal is filed as ordered, the show cause hearing will be automatically vacated. Further all current filing deadlines and hearings, including the currently scheduled Case Management Conference, shall be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 07/02/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 Stipulation, filed by Pusparaj Mohanty, Hanson Information Systems, Inc., Kaen H Pletsch. Defendants shall have through June 25, 2020 to respond to the Complaint. The Initial Case Management Conference is continued unt il July 20, 2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor of this Court. The last day to meet and confer re initial disclosures, early settlement, ADR process selection and discovery plan is June 29, 2010. The last day to file ADR certification signed by parties and counsel is June 29, 2010. The last day to file either stipulation to ADR process or notice of need for ADR phone conference is June 29, 2010. The last day to file Rule 26(f) report, complete initial disclosures or state objection in Rule 26(f) report, and to file joint case management conference statement is July 13, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 05/24/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisco Systems, Inc. v. Hanson Information Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Emily J. Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanson Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaen H Pletsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pusparaj Mohanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?