Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. McInnis et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas Rich McInnis and Sarah Ann Unger
Case Number: 5:2010cv01614
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Koh denying 42 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 51 Motion to Set Aside Default. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/11/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING 31 Ex Parte Application for an Order Vacating the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Koh on 12/13/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE to September 10, 2010 re 14 . Signed by Judge Koh on 8/25/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. McInnis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Rich McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Ann Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?